+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 1/2/2015 @ 12:00 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 913 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 19, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On December 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on veterans, military affairs and homeland security
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 not adopted
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Title amended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 634 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On October 1, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 25, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 03/21/2014
On March 20, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Military and Veterans Affairs
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative David Knezek
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor