+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On December 31, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 364'20
- Filed with Secretary of State 01/04/2021 12:20 PM
- Approved by the Governor 01/04/2021 10:12 AM
On December 21, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2020 07:09 PM
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
On December 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Immediate effect defeated
- Passed roll call # 597 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On May 19, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 202 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Read a third time
On May 13, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-4) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-4)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/29/2020
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rebekah Warren
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor