+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On December 31, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 401'16
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2016 @ 2:12 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/29/2016 @ 3:58 PM
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/22/2016 @ 1:26 PM
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Placed on immediate passage
- Immediate effect defeated
- Inserted full title
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed roll call # 797 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On December 7, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed Roll Call # 574 Yeas 85 Nays 22
- Transmitted
On September 22, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 03/02/2016
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kurt Heise
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor