+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 344'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/16/2018 @ 1:38 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/16/2018 @ 8:54 AM
On October 4, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/4/2018 @ 10:00 AM
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 575 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 150 Yeas 106 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/11/2018
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sherry Gay-Dagnogo
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor