+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 343'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/16/2018 @ 8:52 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/16/2018 @ 1:36 PM
On October 4, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 10/4/2018 @ 9:58 AM
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 587 Yeas 104 Nays 2
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 574 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 149 Yeas 105 Nays 2
- Transmitted
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/11/2018
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Diana Farrington