+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 28, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/28/2016 @ 11:17 AM
On December 15, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 720 Yeas 101 Nays 7
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On December 14, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On December 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 764 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On December 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy
On November 29, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 514 Yeas 102 Nays 5
- Read a third time
On November 10, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a second time
On September 20, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/24/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ken Yonker
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor