+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 164'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/8/2016 @ 2:32 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/9/2016 @ 1:58 PM
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 6/2/2016 @ 3:54 PM
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 333 Yeas 103 Nays 6
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 316 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On March 16, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 109 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Read a third time
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On March 8, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/24/2016
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Joel Johnson
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor