+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 204'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/20/2018 @ 1:38 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/19/2018 @ 8:26 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/11/2018 @ 10:58 AM
On June 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 397 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 260 Yeas 96 Nays 13
- Read a third time
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-6 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-6
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2018
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Curt VanderWall