+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Postponed temporarily
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with full title
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed roll call # 1039 yeas 32 nays 6 excused 0 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On December 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rule suspended
On December 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of general orders
- Discharge committee approved
On December 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on transportation
On December 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 684 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Title amended
On December 4, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On May 15, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2018
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Holly Hughes