+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 193'16 with immediate effect
- Presented to the Governor 6/13/2016 @ 3:56 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/21/2016 @ 2:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/21/2016 @ 2:17 PM
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 419 Yeas 57 Nays 52
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of general orders
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Rules suspended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 422 yeas 20 nays 17 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On June 8, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Postponed temporarily
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on immediate passage
On June 2, 2016 in the House:
- Postponed temporarily
- Returned as requested
- Rule suspended
- Vote on passage reconsidered
- Motion to refer to third reading reconsidered
- Returned to second reading
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 389 Yeas 57 Nays 51
- Title amended
- Retransmitted
- Placed on immediate passage
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- House requests return
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 219 Yeas 55 Nays 53
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Title amended
- Transmitted
On May 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 02/18/2016
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Amanda Price