+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 243'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2018 @ 2:18 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2018 @ 9:26 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:18 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 454 yeas 35 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
- Amendment(s) defeated
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 107 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2018
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kevin Hertel
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor