+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On September 25, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 339'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 9/12/2018 @ 11:44 AM
- Presented to the Governor 9/11/2018 @ 9:26 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 9/13/2018 @ 9:10 AM
On September 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 560 yeas 31 nays 4 excused 2 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On September 5, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On May 30, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 435 Yeas 97 Nays 10
- Transmitted
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/10/2018
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Klint Kesto