+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 8, 2018 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Education Reform
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 12/13/2017
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Liability Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pamela Hornberger
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor