+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 119'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/01/2020 01:32 PM
- Approved by the Governor 07/01/2020 10:44 AM
- Presented to the Governor 06/23/2020 11:08 AM
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 196 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On February 20, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 102 Yeas 103 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On February 19, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-1)
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/21/2020
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sara Cambensy