+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 16, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 226'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/26/2014 @ 1:56 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/21/2014 @ 5:30 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/13/2014 @ 2:48 PM
On June 10, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 410 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole
On May 8, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 220 Yeas 105 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On May 1, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/19/2014
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bradford Jacobsen
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor