+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On July 21, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 121'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 07/01/2020 10:48 AM
- Presented to the Governor 06/25/2020 12:02 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 07/01/2020 01:36 PM
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 257 Yeas 103 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On June 17, 2020 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 198 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On June 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On June 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 60 Yeas 104 Nays 3 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/14/2020
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sara Cambensy
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor