+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 212'17 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 12/19/2017 @ 7:38 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/19/2017 @ 9:54 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/20/2017 @ 3:04 PM
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Rules suspended
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Amendment(s) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with amendment(s)
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with amendment(s)
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 510 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 12, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with amendment(s) with immediate effect
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate amendment(s) concurred in Roll Call # 476 Yeas 106 Nays 3
- Bill ordered enrolled
On December 7, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Placed on third reading
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 452 Yeas 107 Nays 3
- Transmitted
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/30/2017
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Michigan Competitiveness
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Gary Howell