+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 26'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 2/14/2018 @ 1:58 PM
- Approved by the Governor 2/12/2018 @ 11:06 AM
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 2/2/2018 @ 3:37 PM
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 43 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in by 2/3 vote
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by 2/3 vote; given immediate effect roll call # 52 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on appropriations
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 11 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/29/2017
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Vanessa Guerra
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor