+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 15, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 281'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/29/2018 @ 11:06 AM
- Approved by the Governor 6/28/2018 @ 7:14 AM
- Presented to the Governor 6/25/2018 @ 3:32 PM
On June 12, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 492 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On May 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 169 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 29, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/28/2017
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sheldon Neeley
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor