+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 67'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 05/05/2022 04:56 PM
- Approved by the Governor 05/05/2022 02:54 PM
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 04/28/2022 12:13 PM
On April 26, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 167 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 4
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
- Rule suspended
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 123 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On December 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 624 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On December 7, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On August 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/18/2021
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Michele Hoitenga
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor