+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On December 10, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 9, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 02/05/2014
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Pete Lund