+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On October 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 355'14 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/21/2014 @ 1:38 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/21/2014 @ 10:58 AM
- Presented to the Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:44 PM
On October 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 599 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Rule suspended
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
- Roll Call # 550 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On October 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
On May 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on banking and financial institutions
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 276 Yeas 110 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On May 21, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted and amended
- Substitute H-2 not adopted
- Read a second time
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/31/2014
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Nancy Jenkins
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor