+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On September 7, 2016 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Appropriations
On June 7, 2016 in the House:
- Conference report received
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to conference committee 05/24/2016
- Senate conferees named 05/24/2016: Sens. John Proos Marty Knollenberg Vincent Gregory
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate named conferees 05/24/2016: sens. john proos, marty knollenberg, vincent gregory
On May 19, 2016 in the House:
- House conferees named 05/19/2016: Reps. Dave Pagel Chris Afendoulis Jeff Irwin
On May 18, 2016 in the House:
- Roll Call # 288 Yeas 0 Nays 109
- Senate substitute S-1 nonconcurred in
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed roll call # 280 yeas 27 nays 10 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 17, 2016 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Rules suspended
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-2 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 241 Yeas 71 Nays 37
- Transmitted
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-2
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 01/28/2016
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dave Pagel
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor