+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 61'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/10/2020 02:20 PM
- Approved by the Governor 03/10/2020 01:48 PM
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 03/02/2020 09:28 AM
On February 27, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 92 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on energy and technology
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 32 Yeas 105 Nays 1 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Read a third time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On January 15, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 11, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means
On December 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 12/04/2019
On December 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Communications and Technology
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Triston Cole
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor