+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 42'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/23/2022 10:52 AM
- Approved by the Governor 03/23/2022 09:49 AM
On March 16, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 03/16/2022 03:42 PM
On March 15, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 117 Yeas 93 Nays 10 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Senate substitute (S-1) concurred in
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-1) with immediate effect and full title
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 73 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-1)
- Substitute (s-1) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-1)
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-1)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-1)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on health policy and human services
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Title amended
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 562 Yeas 91 Nays 9 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Read a third time
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On November 4, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/17/2021
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Abdullah Hammoud