+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (25)
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee on Judiciary
On November 30, 2021 in the House:
- Vetoed by the Governor 11/30/2021
- Presented to the Governor 11/17/2021 02:57 PM
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 443 yeas 34 nays 1 excused 1 not voting 0
On November 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On November 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On October 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary and public safety
On October 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 475 Yeas 67 Nays 40 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On October 13, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On October 5, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On August 18, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 08/17/2021
On August 17, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Luke Meerman
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor