+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned PA 40'22 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 03/23/2022 10:48 AM
- Approved by the Governor 03/23/2022 09:45 AM
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 03/09/2022 02:54 PM
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll call Roll Call # 96 Yeas 101 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Senate substitute (S-3) concurred in
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-3) with immediate effect and full title
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 50 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-3)
- Substitute (s-3) concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-3)
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-3)
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-3)
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on elections
On December 14, 2021 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 613 Yeas 102 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On September 28, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On July 15, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/14/2021
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Elections and Ethics
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bradley Slagh
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor