+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On June 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On April 30, 2014 in the House:
- Recommendation concurred in
- Reported with recommendation for referral to Committee on Oversight
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/24/2013
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rose Mary Robinson
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor