+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 8, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 185'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/08/2020 12:26 PM
- Approved by the Governor 10/08/2020 11:14 AM
On September 24, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 09/24/2020 01:04 PM
On September 15, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On September 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 294 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On September 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors, and veterans
On June 3, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 225 Yeas 109 Nays 0 Excused 0 Not Voting 0
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-2) adopted
- Read a second time
On May 27, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-2)
On March 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On November 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/20/2019
On November 13, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Families, Children, and Seniors
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Matt Hall
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor