+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On February 28, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 111 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On February 27, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 28, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/09/2017
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Klint Kesto