+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 184 Yeas 104 Nays 4
- Read a third time
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Amended
- Read a second time
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/23/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Brian Banks
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor