+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 5, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 170'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/4/2018 @ 10:44 AM
- Approved by the Governor 6/3/2018 @ 8:35 PM
On May 29, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/24/2018 @ 2:40 PM
On May 22, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Roll Call # 347 Yeas 70 Nays 38
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 300 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on commerce
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 78 Yeas 70 Nays 39
- Read a third time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/08/2017
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Trade
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Steve Marino
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor