+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 22, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 329'14 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/15/2014 @ 11:48 AM
- Presented to the Governor 10/7/2014 @ 2:34 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/16/2014 @ 3:35 PM
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On October 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 618 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On October 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on families, seniors and human services
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 120 Yeas 108 Nays 1
- Read a third time
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 01/23/2014
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Criminal Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Nancy Jenkins
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor