+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 149'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/16/2018 @ 10:10 AM
- Approved by the Governor 5/15/2018 @ 1:56 PM
On May 8, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/4/2018 @ 4:37 PM
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 256 Yeas 99 Nays 10
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and full title
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 237 yeas 25 nays 10 excused 2 not voting 0
- Immediate effect defeated
- Substitute s-1 adopted
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 132 Yeas 99 Nays 9
- Read a third time
- Placed on immediate passage
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/08/2017
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Martin Howrylak
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor