+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 94'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 3/26/2018 @ 12:24 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/26/2018 @ 3:16 PM
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/19/2018 @ 9:52 AM
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect
On March 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 145 yeas 34 nays 1 excused 2 not voting 0
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 6 Yeas 102 Nays 5
- Title amended
On January 11, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 9, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/08/2017
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Roger Victory
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor