+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On January 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Placed on third reading
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Passed Roll Call # 489 Yeas 104 Nays 6
- Transmitted
On December 5, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/07/2017
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Law and Justice
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Thomas Albert
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor