+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 10, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 140'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 5/10/2018 @ 10:54 AM
- Approved by the Governor 5/9/2018 @ 3:40 PM
On May 1, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/30/2018 @ 11:13 PM
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 231 yeas 37 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On April 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 142 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/01/2017
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Bronna Kahle
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor