+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 80'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:30 PM
- Approved by the Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:57 AM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/12/2018 @ 2:28 PM
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 131 yeas 35 nays 0 excused 2 not voting 0
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on natural resources
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 14 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/31/2017
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Natural Resources
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Sue Allor
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor