+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 110'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 4/24/2018 @ 10:50 AM
- Approved by the Governor 4/24/2018 @ 10:15 AM
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 4/12/2018 @ 2:35 PM
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On April 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 186 yeas 33 nays 0 excused 4 not voting 0
On March 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On February 22, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 96 Yeas 108 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/31/2017
On October 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Tim Sneller
+ − Sponsors (40)
Type:
Primary Sponsor