+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 16, 2022 in the House:
- Approved by the Governor 06/16/2022 11:20 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 06/16/2022 05:00 PM
- Assigned PA 105'22
On June 9, 2022 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 06/09/2022 12:47 PM
On June 7, 2022 in the House:
- Senate substitute (S-2) concurred in
- Roll call Roll Call # 281 Yeas 94 Nays 13 Excused 0 Not Voting 3
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On May 26, 2022 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute (S-2) with full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
On May 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amendment(s) defeated
- Passed roll call # 282 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Substitute (s-2) concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute (s-2)
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably with substitute (s-2)
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute (s-2)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education and career readiness
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 566 Yeas 57 Nays 43 Excused 0 Not Voting 7
- Transmitted
On November 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Placed on third reading
On November 2, 2021 in the House:
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
- Referred to second reading
On July 14, 2021 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 07/01/2021
On July 1, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced by Representative Diana Farrington
- Read a first time
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor