+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On July 13, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned PA 265'16 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 6/27/2016 @ 1:11 PM
- Presented to the Governor 6/22/2016 @ 10:48 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/28/2016 @ 11:40 AM
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Title amendment agreed to
- Roll Call # 432 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Senate substitute S-1 concurred in
- Rule suspended
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-1 with immediate effect and title amendment
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-1
- Substitute s-1 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-1
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 417 yeas 36 nays 1 excused 0 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on agriculture
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 68 Yeas 105 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-1 adopted
- Read a second time
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-1
On December 18, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 12/18/2015
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dan Lauwers
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor