+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 30'20 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 02/13/2020 02:49 PM
- Approved by the Governor 02/13/2020 02:24 PM
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 02/12/2020 12:22 PM
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 41 yeas 34 nays 3 excused 1 not voting 0
- Placed on immediate passage
- Rules suspended
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably without amendment
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Full title agreed to
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 38 Yeas 96 Nays 11 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
- Read a second time
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/05/2019
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Tourism
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Mark Huizenga