+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned PA 29'20 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 02/13/2020 02:22 PM
- Presented to the Governor 02/12/2020 12:24 PM
- Filed with Secretary of State 02/13/2020 02:47 PM
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Placed on immediate passage
- Inserted full title
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
- Full title agreed to
- Bill ordered enrolled
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 40 yeas 35 nays 2 excused 1 not voting 0
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on economic and small business development
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 37 Yeas 95 Nays 12 Excused 0 Not Voting 2
- Read a third time
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-3)
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Substitute (H-3) adopted
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Ways and Means, with substitute (H-2)
On November 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 11/05/2019
On October 31, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Tourism
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Rebekah Warren