+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On December 31, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 456'14 with immediate effect 2014 ADDENDA
- Approved by the Governor 12/28/2014 @ 11:20 AM 2014 ADDENDA
- Filed with Secretary of State 1/2/2015 @ 3:02 PM 2014 ADDENDA
On December 30, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 12/23/2014 @ 2:12 PM
On December 18, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 763 Yeas 90 Nays 20
- Senate substitute S-3 concurred in
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended
- Substitute s-3 concurred in
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-3
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-3
- Placed on immediate passage
- Inserted full title
On December 17, 2014 in the House:
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-3 with immediate effect and full title
- Laid over one day under the rules
On December 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 845 yeas 21 nays 16 excused 1 not voting 0
On December 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-2
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-2
On October 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on finance
On October 2, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 561 Yeas 87 Nays 20
- Placed on immediate passage
- Read a third time
- Transmitted
On May 28, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On December 11, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 12/11/2013
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tax Policy
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Dale Zorn
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor