+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 17, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 347'18 with immediate effect
- Approved by the Governor 10/16/2018 @ 9:02 AM
- Presented to the Governor 10/5/2018 @ 11:12 AM
- Filed with Secretary of State 10/16/2018 @ 1:44 PM
On October 2, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Roll Call # 586 Yeas 102 Nays 4
- Senate substitute S-2 concurred in
On September 27, 2018 in the House:
- Laid over one day under the rules
- Returned from Senate with substitute S-2 with immediate effect and full title
On September 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading with substitute s-2
- Substitute s-2 concurred in
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably with substitute s-2
- Rules suspended
- Placed on immediate passage
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 578 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
- Inserted full title
On September 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee of the whole with substitute s-1
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Reported favorably with substitute s-1
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on judiciary
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read a third time
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 251 Yeas 109 Nays 0
- Transmitted
On April 24, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-3 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-3
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/25/2017
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Financial Services
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Diana Farrington
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor