+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On December 28, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned PA 229'17 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 12/21/2017 @ 10:38 AM
- Approved by the Governor 12/20/2017 @ 12:40 PM
- Presented to the Governor 12/19/2017 @ 3:32 PM
On December 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 527 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On December 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On December 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On November 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on oversight
On November 8, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 385 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On November 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On November 2, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 25, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/24/2017
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Oversight
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Beau LaFave
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor