+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on regulatory reform
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed by 3/4 vote; given immediate effect Roll Call # 48 Yeas 102 Nays 2 Excused 0 Not Voting 5
- Read a third time
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute (H-1) adopted
- Read a second time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute (H-1)
On December 10, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Judiciary
On October 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/29/2019
On October 24, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Regulatory Reform
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Frank Liberati