+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on education
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 88 Yeas 89 Nays 14
- Read a third time
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Substitute H-4 adopted and amended
- Read a second time
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation with substitute H-4
On December 16, 2015 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 12/16/2015
On December 15, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Amanda Price