+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 20, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned PA 78'18 with immediate effect
- Filed with Secretary of State 3/19/2018 @ 1:26 PM
- Approved by the Governor 3/19/2018 @ 11:45 AM
On March 13, 2018 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 3/8/2018 @ 2:20 PM
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 128 yeas 36 nays 0 excused 1 not voting 0
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on outdoor recreation and tourism
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed; given immediate effect Roll Call # 18 Yeas 106 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 6, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On October 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill electronically reproduced 10/19/2017
On October 19, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Tourism and Outdoor Recreation
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Kim LaSata
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor