+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (26)
On June 4, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned PA 143'14
- Filed with Secretary of State 6/3/2014 @ 4:08 PM
- Approved by the Governor 6/3/2014 @ 11:02 AM
On May 22, 2014 in the House:
- Presented to the Governor 5/22/2014 @ 2:02 PM
On May 20, 2014 in the House:
- Bill ordered enrolled
- Full title agreed to
- Returned from Senate without amendment with immediate effect and full title
On May 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inserted full title
- Passed; given immediate effect roll call # 299 yeas 38 nays 0 excused 0 not voting 0
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on order of third reading
- Reported by committee of the whole favorably without amendment(s)
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported favorably without amendment
- Committee recommended immediate effect
- Referred to committee of the whole
On January 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to committee on insurance
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted
- Passed Roll Call # 13 Yeas 107 Nays 0
- Read a third time
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on third reading
- Read a second time
On December 10, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to second reading
- Reported with recommendation without amendment
On November 14, 2013 in the House:
- Printed bill filed 11/14/2013
On November 13, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Insurance
- Read a first time
- Introduced by Representative Ben Glardon